|
08/04/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 177, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1851.).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1468.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|