|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 5069.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3560.)
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 9).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|