02/02/2012 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and RLS. | |||
08/29/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/25/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
05/26/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |||
05/12/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1352.) | |||
05/09/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |