04/07/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 565.). | |||
04/06/2011 | Joint Rule 62(a) and Assembly Rule 56 suspended by unanimous consent for the bill to be heard in the Assembly Committee on Health, pending receipt from the Senate. (Page 849.) | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/05/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/04/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |||
03/31/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
03/07/2011 | Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
02/22/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
02/22/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 421.) | |||
02/18/2011 | Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/11/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |||
01/10/2011 | Read first time. To print. |