06/13/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.) | |||
05/16/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
04/14/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |