|
10/07/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 3202.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2345.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 1337.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1278.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|