07/03/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
01/26/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
01/26/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3607.) | |||
01/23/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
01/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19). | |||
01/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/03/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |