06/30/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/16/2011 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |||
06/01/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/01/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 16. Page 1696.) | |||
05/09/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 4). | |||
04/26/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/14/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |