|
09/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 281, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2018.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1352.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|