|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 1808.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|