06/13/2012 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. | |||
01/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
01/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 3622.) | |||
01/26/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 3591.) | |||
01/19/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/18/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
01/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (January 11). | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |