06/20/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/23/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 1496.) | |||
05/09/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/05/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4). | |||
04/27/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2011 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13). | |||
03/14/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |