01/12/2012 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
01/11/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | |||
01/05/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
01/04/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/05/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |||
04/13/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |