|
08/31/2011
|
In committee: That the measure be held in committee pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 15. Page 1558.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|