LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB118
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB118
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB118
Action History
03/07/2011
Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
02/22/2011
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
02/22/2011
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 422.)
02/18/2011
Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
01/11/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
01/10/2011
Read first time. To print.