|
02/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1445.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|