|
08/28/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Correa.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1963.).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1565.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|