|
10/04/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3123.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2307.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 1346.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|