|
08/31/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Ma.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2127.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 1712.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|