|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1353.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|