|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 516, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2848.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2126.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|