|
02/01/2012
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 10).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|