|
07/11/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 75, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1573.).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1435.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1225.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|