|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2311.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|