02/01/2012 | Died on inactive file. | |||
06/02/2011 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Mansoor. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1632.) | |||
05/09/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/04/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |||
04/06/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |