|
09/07/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2496.).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 18. Page 1959.).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 1469.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|