|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 408, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1574.).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1442.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|