California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill August 9, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill January 24, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012