08/18/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
08/16/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/15/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/29/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/13/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/19/2011 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.) | |||
05/16/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |||
04/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |