|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1810.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|