California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB124 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill July 14, 2011
Bill June 29, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011