|
07/09/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 52, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3959.).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3541.)
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|