|
07/15/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 90, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2183.).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 1684.).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and AGRI.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|