|
08/03/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2247.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1712.).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1353.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|