California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1267 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 07/13/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1267ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 5, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 11, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2011 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Halderman FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to add Section 2236.2 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to medicine. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1267, Halderman. Physicians and surgeons: certificate. Existing law, the Medical Practice Act, provides for the licensure and regulation of physicians and surgeons by the Medical Board of California. Existing law requires that a physician and surgeon's certificate be suspended automatically when the holder of the certificate is incarcerated after a felony conviction. This bill would require that a physician and surgeon's certificate be automatically placed on inactive status during any period of incarceration after a misdemeanor conviction. The bill would require the reason for this type of inactive status to be disclosed, as specified. The bill would require a certificate placed on inactive status to be returned by the board to its prior or appropriate status after receiving notice that the physician and surgeon is no longer incarcerated, as specified, and would require the board to adopt regulations in this regard. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2236.2 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 2236.2. (a) Notwithstanding Article 9 (commencing with Section 700) of Chapter 1 of Division 2 or any other provision of law, a physician and surgeon's certificate shall be automatically placed on inactive status during any period of time that the holder of the certificate is incarcerated after conviction of a misdemeanor. (b) A physician and surgeon's certificate placed on inactive status pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be returned by the board to its prior or appropriate status within five business days of receiving notice that the physician and surgeon is no longer incarcerated. The board shall adopt regulations that specify the type of notice required to be submitted to the board. (c) The reason for the inactive status described in subdivision (a) shall be disclosed on the board's Internet Web site.