LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB127
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB127
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB127
Action History
01/18/2012
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
05/03/2011
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
04/11/2011
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
03/31/2011
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and APPR.
01/12/2011
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
01/11/2011
Read first time. To print.