|
09/30/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4955.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 3608.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|