01/30/2012 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3634.). | |||
01/09/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/05/2012 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Feuer. | |||
06/15/2011 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1944.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
06/03/2011 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1864.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Feuer. | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/17/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/16/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |