|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Correa.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1511.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|