02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/27/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/19/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/18/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/11/2011 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/12/2011 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/25/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/24/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/20/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |||
02/18/2011 | Read first time. To print. |