|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 518, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2922.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 2204.).
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 22).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1783.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|