|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 538, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 2872.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 1963.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 1280.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|