|
06/28/2012
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 6. Page 1701.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|