|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 1812.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|