|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1969.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 1672.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|