|
07/25/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 117, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2158.).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1573.).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 910.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|