|
05/22/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1280.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|