LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1325
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1325
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1325
Compare Versions
AB1325 Chaptered September 19, 2012
AB1325 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB1325 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1325 Amended June 19, 2012
AB1325 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1325 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1325 Chaptered September 19, 2012
AB1325 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB1325 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1325 Amended June 19, 2012
AB1325 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1325 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare