|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 299, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2626.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1853.).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1553.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|