California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB134 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill April 15, 2011
Bill March 23, 2011